MD SB802 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program to improve data collection on uninsured individuals and to maximize enrollment of eligible uninsured individuals in affordable insurance programs; requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to establish a Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program Advisory Workgroup; requiring the Comptroller to include a certain checkoff, to indicate whether an individual is interested in obtaining minimum essential health coverage, on certain State income tax forms; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-15) (Y: 123 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 424
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (123-15)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {376981/2 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-27HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-26HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-03-22HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-21SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-20SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments {157975/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0802&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0802f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0802t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0802e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_424_sb0802e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0802_15797501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0802_37698102.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/sb0802.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0802_b&t.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0802_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0721.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0802_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1242.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1179.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback