MD SB803 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain hospitals to provide each patient with written notice that includes certain information related to outpatient facility fees that are charged for services provided at the hospital; requiring the Health Education and Advocacy Unit within the Attorney General's Office, in consultation with the Health Care Services Cost Review Commission, consumers and other stakeholders, to develop a uniform disclosure form and a process for determining and updating the range of fees and fee estimates as required by the Act; etc.
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] |
Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-05 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2019-04-04 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {927971/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Communications
Cybersecurity
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Fees
Forms
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
internet
Language
Liability
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Postal Service
Power of Attorney
Prices
Public Information
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Uncompensated Care
Attorney General
Communications
Cybersecurity
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Fees
Forms
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
internet
Language
Liability
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Postal Service
Power of Attorney
Prices
Public Information
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Uncompensated Care