MD SB805 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 192
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 192
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, to $125,000, the amount of money that the county commissioners of Calvert County, Charles County, and St. Mary's County are required to appropriate each year for the Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland to foster cooperative planning and development in the region.
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 192 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Floor Amendment {683523/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Senator Bailey) Adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB387 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 191
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Calvert County
Charles County
Counties - Generally
County Commissioners
Economic and Community Development
Local Government Mandates
Revenue and Taxes
St. Mary's County
Tri-County Council
Zoning and Planning
Budgets
Calvert County
Charles County
Counties - Generally
County Commissioners
Economic and Community Development
Local Government Mandates
Revenue and Taxes
St. Mary's County
Tri-County Council
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 13 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 13 | 611 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |