MD SB808 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the date from June 1, 2019, to April 1, 2020, by which the Department of Natural Resources is required to convene in a certain manner the Oyster Advisory Commission; altering the version of the fishery management plan for oysters that the Department is required to develop before taking certain management action governing oyster sanctuaries; requiring the Department to include certain information in the interim report to be submitted by August 1, 2021, to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {554735/1 Adopted |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB911 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2020 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Natural Resources | 4 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |