MD SB809 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each correctional facility to have a written policy in place regarding the medical care of pregnant inmates that addresses the use of medical isolation or restrictive housing for certain purposes, during pregnancy and during a certain post-pregnancy period; establishing that a pregnant inmate may not be involuntarily placed in certain restrictive housing, with certain exceptions; providing that a certain pregnant inmate may be placed in certain restrictive housing if a certain managing official makes a certain determination; etc.
Title
Correctional Facilities - Restrictive Housing - Pregnant Inmates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-05 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2019-04-01 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {688778/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Correctional Institutions
Discipline
Diseases
Health
Health Care Facilities
Notices
Pregnancy
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Safety
Discipline
Diseases
Health
Health Care Facilities
Notices
Pregnancy
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Safety