MD SB81 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB105
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Transportation to undertake promptly all steps necessary to complete the design, engineering, and National Environmental Policy Act process and secure a record of decision for the Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project; requiring the Governor to include in the annual State budget in each of fiscal years 2023 through 2027 an appropriation from the Transportation Trust Fund of at least $5,000,000, contingent on the receipt of federal funds to provide matching funds for a certain environmental impact study; etc.
Title
Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 28 NV: 17 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-28) |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {409139/1 Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2020-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB414 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 738
SB105 (Carry Over) 2019-12-19 - Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
SB105 (Carry Over) 2019-12-19 - Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Boundaries
Budgets
Charles County
Construction
Environmental Matters
Federal Government
Governor
Mass Transit
Prince George's County
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Zoning and Planning
Boundaries
Budgets
Charles County
Construction
Environmental Matters
Federal Government
Governor
Mass Transit
Prince George's County
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Zoning and Planning