MD SB816 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering eligibility for a credit authorized against the county or municipal corporation property tax for the surviving spouses of certain retired veterans who are at least 65 years of age and have not remarried; providing that certain surviving spouses who are under the age of 65 years and have not remarried may continue to receive the tax credit if the surviving spouses qualified for and received the tax credit before June 1, 2019; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Credit - Surviving Spouse of Veteran

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 36
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-04-03HouseHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-03HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2019-04-02HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-01SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {339936/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback