MD SB822 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that certain provisions of a recorded covenant or restriction, a declaration, or the bylaws or rules of a condominium or homeowners association are void and unenforceable; establishing certain requirements and procedures relating to an application to the governing body of a condominium or homeowners association to install or use electric vehicle recharging equipment; requiring certain owners of electric vehicle recharging equipment to be responsible for certain costs and disclosures; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
2019-02-27SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback