MD SB828 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, on behalf of certain sponsors, to submit to the U.S. Department of Agriculture certain waivers relating to the federal Summer Food Service Program; requiring the Department to prepare and submit certain waiver requests in accordance with certain guidelines; and requiring the Department to apply to renew certain waivers under certain circumstances.
Title
State Department of Education - Summer Food Service Program - Regulatory Waivers (Summer Meals Waiver Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1135 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Subjects
Agriculture
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Exemptions
Food
Rules and Regulations
Time
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Exemptions
Food
Rules and Regulations
Time