MD SB829 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Making certain members of the State Retirement and Pension System eligible to receive creditable service at retirement for unused sick leave accrued by the member in certain systems in the State Retirement and Pension System under certain circumstances; providing for the calculation of the creditable service for unused sick leave accrued by certain members in certain systems; providing a certain adjustment to the benefits of certain retirees; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick Leave

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-11HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-06SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-18SenateHearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
2019-02-18SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/28 at 9:00 a.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback