MD SB830 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to convene the Oyster Advisory Commission, in coordination with the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science, on or before June 1, 2019; requiring the Department, in coordination with the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science and the Commission, to develop a package of consensus recommendations regarding the fishery management plan for oysters; requiring the Commission to develop certain recommendations to achieve certain oyster management goals; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-12) (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-42) (Y: 98 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {793428/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (41-95) (Y: 41 N: 95 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {743424/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (41-93) (Y: 41 N: 93 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {323220/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (41-94) (Y: 41 N: 94 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-39) (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (98-42)
2019-04-05HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (34-12)
2019-04-05SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseDelegates Stein, Barve, and Love
2019-04-03HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-03HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2019-04-01SenateSenators Pinsky, Young, and Simonaire
2019-04-01SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-01SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-01SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (98-39)
2019-03-29HouseFloor Amendment {323220/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (41-94)
2019-03-29HouseFloor Amendment {743424/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (41-93)
2019-03-29HouseFloor Amendment {793428/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (41-95)
2019-03-28HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments {440419/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (45-2)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12SenateFloor Amendment {663929/1 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {854236/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateLaid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {854236/1
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0830&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0830f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0830t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0830e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0830_85423601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0830_66392901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0830_44041901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0830_32322001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0830_74342401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0830_79342801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0830_37332101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0830_16362901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb0830.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0830_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0531.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0830_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0992.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0993.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0994.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0995.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0830_16362901.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1174.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1363.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/veto_letters/sb0830.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback