MD SB838 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, unless good cause is shown, a petition for writ of error coram nobis may not be filed more than 3 years after the petitioner knew or should have known that the petitioner faces a significant collateral consequence from the conviction that is the basis for the petition.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for Filing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (85-50) (Y: 86 N: 51 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (29-16) (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {623022/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (19-27) (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (29-16) (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {623022/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (19-27) (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (85-50) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-30 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2018-03-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (29-16) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Floor Amendment {623022/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (19-27) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Floor Amendment {623022/1 (Senator Cassilly) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |