MD SB838 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 376
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 376
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering references to the terms "9-1-1 fee" and "additional charge", respectively, to be "State 9-1-1 fee" and "county 9-1-1 fee", respectively, and altering the definition of "public safety answering point" for purposes of provisions of law concerning the 9-1-1 emergency telephone system; renaming the Emergency Number Systems Board to be the Maryland 9-1-1 Board; requiring a certain report by the Department of General Services by June 30, 2020; etc.
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 376 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (130-1) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {606083/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-16 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {527872/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB934 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 375
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Counties
Cybersecurity
Disabilities
Education
Elderly Persons
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fees
Fines
Fire Protection
General Services, Department of
Inspections
Job Training
Language
Mental and Behavioral Health
Occupational Safety
Public Employees
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Counties
Cybersecurity
Disabilities
Education
Elderly Persons
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fees
Fines
Fire Protection
General Services, Department of
Inspections
Job Training
Language
Mental and Behavioral Health
Occupational Safety
Public Employees
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 1 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 304.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 304.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |