MD SB84 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB180
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that the purpose for which licensed funeral establishments and holders of certain permits are authorized to transfer unclaimed cremains of a veteran or an eligible dependent to a veterans service organization under certain circumstances is for the appropriate disposition of the cremains; requiring a funeral establishment or crematory to transfer certain cremains to the Department of Veterans Affairs for the purpose of the appropriate disposition of the cremains; etc.
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {714533/2 Adopted |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-07-13 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB84 (Carry Over) 2020-03-14 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Cemeteries
Cremation
Death
Funerals
Health Occupations
Morticians
Notices
Records
Time
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Cremation
Death
Funerals
Health Occupations
Morticians
Notices
Records
Time
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 7 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |