MD SB84 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 758
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 758
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets certain requirements to administer maintenance injectable medications to a patient under certain circumstances; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, by September 1, 2021, and in consultation with the State Board of Physicians and the State Board of Nursing, to adopt regulations establishing standard procedures; requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and the Maryland Children's Health Program to provide certain coverage for the administering of certain medications by a licensed pharmacist; etc.
Title
Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (Christopher King Access to Treatment Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 758 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-7) |
2021-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {556081/1 Adopted |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {744831/1 Adopted |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB135 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 757
Subjects
Birth Control
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Drugs
Education
Electronic Communication
Fees
Forms
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
Job Training
Licenses
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Nurses
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Records
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Drugs
Education
Electronic Communication
Fees
Forms
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
Job Training
Licenses
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Nurses
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Records
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 148 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 12 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 12 | 509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 716 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |