MD SB842 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the penalty for certain conduct relating to betting, wagering, or gambling; making certain conduct relating to betting, wagering, or gambling a civil offense; establishing that adjudication of a violation under a certain provision of the Act is not a criminal conviction for any purpose and does not impose any of the civil disabilities that may result from a criminal conviction; altering certain penalties; authorizing a certain police officer to issue a certain citation under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Gaming - Civil Offense

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-4) (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 495
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Recede
2019-04-03HouseMotion Recede (Delegate Walker) Adopted
2019-04-01SenateSenators Hough, Ready, and Carter
2019-04-01SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-01SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-01SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
2019-03-28HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments {555762/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-08HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (41-4)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0842&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0842f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0842t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_495_sb0842t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0842_55576201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/sb0842.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0842_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0400.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0842_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0842_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1006.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1163.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback