MD SB845 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the purpose and authorized uses of the Maryland Corps Program Fund to include covering expenses incurred to study certain matters and providing funding to match certain gifts or grants; requiring, in fiscal year 2021 and each fiscal year thereafter, funds for the Maryland Corps Program to be as provided in the State budget to cover certain additional expenses; and requiring, for fiscal year 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter, the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $150,000 to the Fund.
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1016 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Gifts
Grants
Higher Education
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Work, Labor and Employment
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Gifts
Grants
Higher Education
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 24 | 1108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 24 | 1109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |