MD SB846 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring local correctional facilities to conduct an assessment of the mental health and substance use status of each inmate using evidence-based screening and assessments to determine whether opioid treatment or medication-assisted treatment for opioid addiction is appropriate; requiring each local correctional facility to make available at least one formulation of each FDA-approved full opioid agonist, partial opioid agonist, and long-acting opioid antagonist used for the treatment of opioid use disorders; etc.
Title
Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2019-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary and Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-25 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {197176/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Special Order until 3/21 (Senator King) Adopted |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {197176/1 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator King) Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {197176/1 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Institutions
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Drugs
Examinations
Federal Government
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Howard County
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Montgomery County
Opioids
Pregnancy
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prince George's County
Prisoners
Public Health
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
St. Mary's County
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Time
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Institutions
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Drugs
Examinations
Federal Government
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Howard County
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Montgomery County
Opioids
Pregnancy
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prince George's County
Prisoners
Public Health
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
St. Mary's County
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Time