MD SB847 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain requirement regarding the confidentiality of certain proceedings, testimony, and other evidence; prohibiting members and staff of the Commission to Restore Trust in Policing from being required to sign a confidentiality agreement to receive documents or files; altering, from 2019 to 2020, the due date for a report that the Commission is required to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly; and requesting the Governor to appropriate sufficient funds to allow the Commission to complete its work.
Title
Baltimore Police Department – Commission to Restore Trust in Policing – Alterations
Sponsors
Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {198174/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Evidence
Governor
Law Enforcement
Public Information
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Subpoenas
Sunset
Baltimore City
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Evidence
Governor
Law Enforcement
Public Information
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Subpoenas
Sunset