MD SB847 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 384
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a court, in determining whether the application of the child support guidelines would be unjust or inappropriate in a particular case, to consider whether an obligor's monthly obligation would leave the obligor with a monthly actual income below 110% the 2019 federal poverty level for an individual; authorizing the court to decline to establish a child support order under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Support – Guidelines

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 384
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-03-15HouseReferred Judiciary
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {438079/1 Adopted
2020-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-06SenateHearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB946 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 383

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Law12201(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law12202(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law12204(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback