MD SB852 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "military spouse" to include the surviving spouse of a service member who dies at any time before an application for a license; altering the definition of "veteran" to include former service members who have been discharged for more than 1 year before an application for a license; requiring units of the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to issue a certain license to certain applicants within 60 days after receiving a completed application; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Veterans and Military Service Members and Spouses - Occupational Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 312
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-01HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-22HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {394530/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-08SenateHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-07SenateReassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback