MD SB853 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "public school employee" as it relates to collective bargaining units of employees in Baltimore County; altering the composition of a unit of employees in Baltimore County; and including a unit of supervisory employees among specified units authorized in Baltimore County.
Title
Baltimore County - Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining Units
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Third Reading Passed (97-40) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-03-23 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-18 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-03-29 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments 587177/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Collective Bargaining
Public Employees
Public Schools
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Public Employees
Public Schools
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment