MD SB853 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified electric companies and telephone companies to coordinate with specified companies the timing of the removal of specified lines so that specified lines are removed within a specified period of time; authorizing the Public Service Commission to adopt specified regulations or issue specified orders; etc.
Title
Utility Companies - Removal of Lines from Utility Poles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
High Voltage Lines
Public Service Commission
Rules and Regulations
Telephones
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Public Service Commission
Rules and Regulations
Telephones
Utilities
Utility Regulation