MD SB853 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a guardian of the property of a specified minor or disabled person to pay or apply income or principal from a specified estate to establish or fund a specified special needs trust, a pooled asset special needs trust account, or an Achieving a Better Life Experience account for the benefit of the minor or disabled person, without court authorization or confirmation; etc.
Title
Guardians of Property and Custodians - Authority to Fund Certain Trusts and Accounts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Assisted Living
Attorney General
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Group Homes
Guardians
Health
Minors
Personal Property
Real Property
Safety
Attorney General
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Group Homes
Guardians
Health
Minors
Personal Property
Real Property
Safety