MD SB856 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Juvenile Justice Reform Council; requiring the Council to develop a framework for reducing juvenile recidivism and increasing public safety and to conduct research into best practices for the treatment of juveniles who are subject to the criminal and juvenile justice systems; requiring the Council to submit an interim report on its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019, and a final report by December 1, 2020; etc.
Title
Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {512615/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment {923329/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment {173023/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {518475/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Safety
Repeate Offenders
Reports
Sunset
Victims
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Safety
Repeate Offenders
Reports
Sunset
Victims