MD SB858 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an institution of higher education, a related medical facility, or an affiliated biomedical research firm to file with the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission a registration to purchase medical cannabis for the purpose of conducting a bona fide research project relating to the medical uses, properties, or composition of cannabis; providing that a certain registration is valid until the Commission receives certain notification; authorizing the Commission to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Academic Research - Medical Uses and Properties of Cannabis
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {868176/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Cannabis
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Data
Forms
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Medical Research
Medical Schools
Medical Treatments
Notices
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Cannabis
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Data
Forms
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Medical Research
Medical Schools
Medical Treatments
Notices
Public Health
Rules and Regulations