MD SB859 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that certain advertisements for medical cannabis, medical cannabis products, or medical cannabis-related services be supported by substantial clinical evidence or data and include information about side effects or risks associated with the use of cannabis; prohibiting advertisements from being false or misleading or from containing certain designs, pictures, illustrations or representations; requiring any website owned, managed, or operated by certain providers to employ a neutral age-screening mechanism; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Advertisements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-01SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-29SenateFloor Amendment {903826/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted
2019-03-29SenateMotion Returned Second Reading (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {388672/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-27SenateSpecial Order until 3/28 (Senator West) Adopted
2019-03-27SenateFavorable with Amendments {388672/1
2019-03-22SenateSpecial Order until 3/26 (Senator Smith) Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {388672/1
2019-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback