MD SB868 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals, in consultation with the Children's Cabinet, to establish a tiered certification structure for residential child and youth care practitioners; requiring the Board to establish training requirements for the residential child and youth care practitioners certified by the Board; requiring, rather than authorizing, the Board to set reasonable fees for specified services; authorizing the Board to waive the fees under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Residential Child and Youth Care Practitioners - Certification - Modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (124-0) | |
2012-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-28 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-24 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2012-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments 124031/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-18 | Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted | |
2012-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments 124031/1 | |
2012-03-17 | Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted | |
2012-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments 124031/1 | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Blind Persons
Child Care
Committees and Commissions
Education
Electronic Government
Examinations
Fees
Health Occupations
Juvenile Facilities
Licenses
Private Schools
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment
Child Care
Committees and Commissions
Education
Electronic Government
Examinations
Fees
Health Occupations
Juvenile Facilities
Licenses
Private Schools
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment