MD SB868 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission to establish a workgroup to carry out the finding and declaration of the General Assembly that it is in the public interest to ensure that the health care protections established by the federal Affordable Care Act (the ACA) continue to protect Maryland residents in light of continued threats to the ACA; requiring the workgroup to monitor certain court cases and the enforcement of the ACA; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance – Consumer Protections and Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-11) (Y: 128 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-6) (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 417
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (128-11)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (39-6)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {397172/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-22SenateHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-14SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-06SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback