MD SB870 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the maximum income limits on eligibility for a certain credit against the State income tax for certain child and dependent care expenses; altering the phase-out of the tax credit; making the credit refundable, subject to certain income limits; increasing, each taxable year, certain income eligibility and refundability thresholds by a certain cost-of-living adjustment; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 432
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {655767/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-15HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-11SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-07SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-06SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-14SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-14SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2019-02-07SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0870&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0870f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0870t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0870e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_432_sb0870e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0870_65576701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb0870.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0870_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0462.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0870_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1189.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1181.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback