MD SB873 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a credit for an employer or insurer for specified payments to a covered employee for temporary total disability benefits under specified circumstances and during a specified period; applying the Act only prospectively; etc.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability Benefits - Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-27 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |