MD SB874 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that certain inmates sentenced to life imprisonment for a crime committed on or after October 1, 2019, are not eligible for parole consideration until having served 25 years without application of diminution of confinement credits; requiring that a certain decision by the Maryland Parole Commission regarding parole of a certain inmate be transmitted to the Governor; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes - Life Imprisonment - Parole Eligibility

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateHearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
2019-03-07SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-14SenateHearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-14SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-08SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback