MD SB879 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-15)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring public schools to devote a part of at least one day to appropriate exercises that relate to Black History Month, with an emphasis on Harriet Tubman and Frederick Douglass and the contributions they made in the fight against slavery; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Primary and Secondary Education - Black History Month - Harriet Tubman and Frederick Douglass

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 313
2019-04-02SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-02SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
2019-03-28HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments {955760/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-15HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-12SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-08SenateHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-08SenateMotion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Benson) Adopted
2019-02-08SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0879&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0879f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0879t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0879e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_313_sb0879e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0879_95576001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0879.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0879_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0522.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0879_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1007.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0943.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback