MD SB880 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a unit or an instrumentality of the State or of a political subdivision to maintain specified electronic mail addresses in a specified database; specifying that the database is confidential and not a public record; prohibiting the database from being disclosed in its entirety except under specified circumstances; establishing the circumstances under which a unit or an instrumentality is required and is authorized to disclose the database in its entirety; etc.
Title
Public Information Act - Electronic Mail Address - Database and Disclosure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Counties
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Privacy
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Counties
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Privacy
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology