MD SB880 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in Maryland; requiring the Task Force to review all federal and State assistance programs, study data on fraud and abuse in welfare programs and develop comprehensive legislative solutions, and develop legislative proposals that strive to help individuals on limited incomes achieve self-sufficiency; requiring the Task Force to report its recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2016; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in Maryland
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {987478/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Domestic Violence
Elderly Persons
Electronic Funds Transfer
Fraud
Human Resources, Department of
Identification
Legislation
Minors
Photography
Reports
Social Services - Generally
Sunset
Victims
Welfare
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Domestic Violence
Elderly Persons
Electronic Funds Transfer
Fraud
Human Resources, Department of
Identification
Legislation
Minors
Photography
Reports
Social Services - Generally
Sunset
Victims
Welfare