MD SB880 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that an insurance producer is not prohibited from charging and collecting a fee, not exceeding $30, for services rendered in issuing a certain certificate of insurance or other evidence of coverage on behalf of a commercial policyholder under certain circumstances.
Title
Commercial Insurance – Certificates of Insurance – Fee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Fees
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Notices
Prices
Salaries and Compensation
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Fees
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Notices
Prices
Salaries and Compensation