MD SB880 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Public Service Commission to establish a customer choice website that allows electric customers to sort electricity suppliers that have open offers in a certain service area, and initiates the transition from one electricity supplier to another; specifying the contents of the website; requiring the Commission to use certain information received from an electricity supplier to maintain the information on the website; requiring the Commission to recover certain costs in a certain manner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Service Commission - Customer Choice Shopping Website

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2019-03-12SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-04SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-14SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback