MD SB885 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to design a voluntary developmental disability self-disclosure card; establishing certain requirements for the card; requiring the Administration to consult with certain groups in designing the card; requiring the Administration to make the card available to certain individuals on request; and prohibiting the Administration from keeping records related to the issuance of the card, subject to a certain exception.
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration – Voluntary Developmental Disability Self–Disclosure Cards – Design and Issuance
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Zucker [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] |
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] | Sen. Chris West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {208078/1 Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1118 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 427
Subjects
Age of Majority
Autism Spectrum
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Developmental Disabilities
Disclosure
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Autism Spectrum
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Developmental Disabilities
Disclosure
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 12 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 16 | 118.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |