MD SB887 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration, when processing an application for a duplicate license of a victim of a robbery or theft whose license is taken during the robbery or theft, to issue the duplicate license free of charge if the victim of the robbery or theft whose license is taken presents a police report of the incident when applying for a duplicate license.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Driver's Licenses - Victims of Robbery or Theft
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Drivers' Licenses
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Reports
Robbery
Theft
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Victims
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Reports
Robbery
Theft
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Victims