MD SB891 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a ticket reseller from selling or offering to sell speculative tickets unless the reseller makes certain disclosures; and requiring a reseller to refund a certain deposit or other consideration within 10 days after the event for which the tickets were sold under certain circumstances.
Title
Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] | Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] |
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2019-03-28 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {837878/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Dealers
Disclosure
Retail Sales
Time
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Dealers
Disclosure
Retail Sales
Time