MD SB893 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, the Maryland Department of Health, and the Behavioral Health Administration jointly to develop and publish a certain handbook regarding safe Internet, social media, and technology usage for certain students, parents, and teachers on or before July 1, 2021; requiring the handbook to include certain information and best practices; requiring certain agencies to consult with certain professionals when developing a certain handbook; etc.
Title
Public Health – Cyber Safety Handbook – Handbook Development and Publication
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Cybersecurity
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government
Health
Health, Department of
internet
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Safety
Students
Teachers
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government
Health
Health, Department of
internet
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Safety
Students
Teachers