MD SB895 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain licensees to post a certain sign in a certain location; altering the minimum age, from 18 to 21, for an individual to purchase or be sold tobacco products; authorizing the Maryland Department of Health to conduct certain inspections of licensed retailers; authorizing the Department to use individuals under the age of 21 years to assist in conducting a certain inspection; exempting certain individuals from a certain minimum age requirement for an individual to purchase or be sold tobacco products; etc.
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsors
Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] |
Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] | Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-11) (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-11) |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment {243926/3 (Senator Ready) Rejected |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Ready) Withdrawn |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Ready) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Kelley) Adopted |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Ready) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment {763928/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {647779/1 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {647779/1 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Age of Majority
Armed Forces
Business Regulation and Occupations
Carroll County
Cecil County
Cigarettes
Circuit Courts
Citations
Clerks of Court
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Counties
Courts
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Equipment
Fees
Fines
Garrett County
Governor
Health
Health, Department of
Hearings
Identification
Inspections
Licenses
Minors
Montgomery County
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Smoking
St. Mary's County
Tobacco
Vending Machines
Work, Labor and Employment
Armed Forces
Business Regulation and Occupations
Carroll County
Cecil County
Cigarettes
Circuit Courts
Citations
Clerks of Court
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Counties
Courts
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Equipment
Fees
Fines
Garrett County
Governor
Health
Health, Department of
Hearings
Identification
Inspections
Licenses
Minors
Montgomery County
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Smoking
St. Mary's County
Tobacco
Vending Machines
Work, Labor and Employment