MD SB896 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the salary of the members of the St. Mary's County Board of Elections to $3,600; and providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of the incumbent members of the St. Mary's County Board of Elections.
Title
St. Mary's County Board of Elections - Salary
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Dyson [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-24 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-21 | First Reading Senate Rules |