MD SB897 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Renaming the University of Maryland Joint Steering Council to be the MPowering Joint Steering Council; requiring the Council to explore opportunities to create registered apprenticeship programs in nursing and other fields; requiring the Governor to include a certain appropriation in the annual State budget for the Council and the University of Maryland Baltimore County; requiring the appropriation to be used as supplemental to funding that otherwise would be appropriated for the Council and the University; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of Maryland Joint Steering Council – Renaming, Duties, and Funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-37) (Y: 99 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-13) (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (99-37)
2019-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {914163/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-04-08HouseHearing 4/08 at 1:30 p.m.
2019-04-05HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-03-20HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (33-13)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {159139/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-28SenateHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-28SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-22SenateHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2019-02-14SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0897&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0897f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0897t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0897e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0897_15913901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0897_91416301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb0897.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0897_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0693.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0897_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1451.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1606.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback