MD SB898 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each law enforcement agency to develop and implement a policy requiring the investigation of a certain officer-involved death; requiring that the policy require the investigation to be performed by at least two investigators who have certain qualifications; requiring the investigators to submit a certain report to a certain State's Attorney at a certain time; requiring the investigators to release the report to the public under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Investigation of an Officer-Involved Death (Law Enforcement Trust and Transparency Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Death
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Privacy
Public Information
Public Safety
Reports
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Privacy
Public Information
Public Safety
Reports