MD SB9 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-07 - Hearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-07 - Hearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain expenses paid or incurred during the taxable year in carrying on a trade or business as a certain medical cannabis grower, processor, dispensary, or independent testing laboratory; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Young [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] |
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-07 | Senate | Hearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m. |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Hearing 1/17 at 1:45 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-07-13 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
Cannabis
Exemptions
Income Tax
Laboratories
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Salaries and Compensation
Taxes - Income
Cannabis
Exemptions
Income Tax
Laboratories
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Salaries and Compensation
Taxes - Income