MD SB9 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Chancellor of the University System of Maryland to act on behalf of the University System of Maryland and certain system institutions for the purpose of collective bargaining; requiring the Chancellor and the exclusive representative to negotiate the terms of one consolidated memorandum of understanding to apply to all bargaining units for employees of all system institutions represented by the exclusive representative; requiring a certain consolidated memorandum of understanding to include certain terms; etc.
Title
State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Applicability, Bargaining Processes, and Memorandums of Understanding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Floor Amendment 423423/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Floor Amendment 423423/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-39) |
2021-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {494064/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Floor Amendment {423423/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected (15-32) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Patterson) Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-10-03 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB486 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-19 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Federal Government
Higher Education
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Universities and Colleges
Work, Labor, and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Federal Government
Higher Education
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Universities and Colleges
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 12 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 2A-09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |