MD SB904 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Health from accepting certain funding under Title X of the federal Public Health Service Act if the Title X program excludes family planning providers and does not require family planning providers to provide a broad range of acceptable and effective medically approved family planning methods and services; and requiring the Governor to fund the Family Planning Program with a certain level of State funds under certain circumstances.
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {153521/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (44-91) (Y: 44 N: 91 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-42) (Y: 95 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (28-16) (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-42) (Y: 95 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (28-16) (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-42) |
2019-04-06 | House | Floor Amendment {153521/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (44-91) |
2019-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2019-04-03 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (28-16) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Special Order until next session (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Floor Amendment {853923/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Kelley) Adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appropriations
Birth Control
Committees and Commissions
Federal Government
Governor
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Public Health
Reproductive Matters
Revenue and Taxes
Birth Control
Committees and Commissions
Federal Government
Governor
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Public Health
Reproductive Matters
Revenue and Taxes