MD SB907 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Law Enforcement Coordinating Council to prevent and reduce crime by coordinating and focusing State resources and ensuring interagency communication and intelligence-sharing; requiring the Council to prepare a certain comprehensive crime plan for the State or for each region of the State; requiring the Council to meet twice each year; requiring the Governor, or a designee, to attend at least one Council meeting each year; requiring the Council to submit an annual report to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Crime Plan and Law Enforcement Councils (Maryland State Crime Plan)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (131-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {212115/1 Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {838276/1 Adopted |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1579 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-25 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Emergency Bills
Governor
Housing
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Parole and Probation
Prerelease and Reentry
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
State Police, Department of
Sunset
Transportation
Victims
Warrants
Work, Labor and Employment
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Emergency Bills
Governor
Housing
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Parole and Probation
Prerelease and Reentry
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
State Police, Department of
Sunset
Transportation
Victims
Warrants
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 2 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 2 | 316 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |