MD SB911 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the intent of the General Assembly to promote gender diversity in corporate management and boardrooms; requiring a certain entity submitting an annual report to the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to include information relating to the number of female members of the board and the total number of members of the board; providing the Act does not apply to a privately held company if at least 75% of the company's shareholders are family members; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gender Diversity in the Boardroom – Annual Report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-6) (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (106-32) (Y: 106 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-6) (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 514
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (40-6)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (106-32)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {185765/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-27HouseHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-26HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2019-03-22HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-21SenateThird Reading Passed (40-6)
2019-03-20SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-20SenateFloor Amendment {973521/3 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments {579737/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSpecial Order until 3/20 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
2019-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {579737/1
2019-03-18SenateLaid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {579737/1
2019-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-22SenateHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2019-02-14SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0911&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0911f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0911t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0911e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_514_sb0911e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0911_57973701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0911_97352103.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0911_18576501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0001/sb0911.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0911_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0723.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0911_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1190.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1182.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback